EP0773186 - Improved trunnion for use with a pantograph jack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VENTRA GROUP INC. 65 Industrial Road, P.O. Box 1170 Tottenham Ontario L0G 1W0 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states VENTRA GROUP INC. 65 Industrial Road, P.O. Box 1170 Tottenham, Ontario L0G 1W0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Bryan D. 358 Bexhill Road Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 6P7 / CA | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Vaughan, Christopher Tammo, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Vaughan, Christopher Tammo, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308096.5 | 07.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | US19950551750 | 07.11.1995 Original published format: US 551750 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773186 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773186 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0773186 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B66F3/22, B66F3/12 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
B66F3/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | B66F3/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/20] | Title | German: | Lagerzapfen für den Gebrauch bei einem Scherenwagenheber | [1997/20] | English: | Improved trunnion for use with a pantograph jack | [1997/20] | French: | Tourillon pour l'utilisation avec une grue à parallélogramme | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.01.2004 | DE | 29.04.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/12] | DE | 29.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2644766 (FABRICATION ACCESSOIRES AUTOMO [FR]) [A] 1,5,8* figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5064171 (ENGEL DARRYL L [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * figures 1-5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0515803 (BILSTEIN AUGUST GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,5,8 * figures 2-6; claim 1 * |