EP0773592 - Thermoelectric conversion module and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imanishi, Yuichiro 104, Maison Hara, 401, Hara 2-chome, Tenpaku-Ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Miyoshi, Makoto 150, Omoteyama, 3-chome, Tenpaku-Ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Tetsuo 18-14, Naruko-Cho, 5-chome, Midori-Ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Kushibiki, Keiko 2-21-10-305, Tsujidomotomachi Fujisawa City, Kanagawa Pref. / JP | 05 /
Shinohara, Kazuhiko 7-41-1-101, Tomiokanishi, Kanazawa-Ku Yokohama City, Kanagawa Pref. / JP | 06 /
Kobayashi, Masakazu 37, Kinugasa-Cho Yokosuka City, Kanagawa Pref. / JP | 07 /
Furuya, Kenji 80-1-102, Kozukue-Cho, Kohoku-Ku Yokohama City, Kanagawa Pref. / JP | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308174.0 | 12.11.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | JP19950294348 | 13.11.1995 Original published format: JP 29434895 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0773592 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0773592 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/32, H01L35/34 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
H10N10/01 (EP,US);
H10N10/17 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/20] | H01L35/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/20] | Title | German: | Thermoelektrischer Umwandlungsmodul und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [1997/20] | English: | Thermoelectric conversion module and method of manufacturing the same | [1997/20] | French: | Module de conversion thermoélectrique et procédé de fabrication | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 15.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS61201484 ; | [A]US2980746 (ROY CLAYDON) [A] 1,10 * figure 1; claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]GB1130334 (G V PLANER LTD) [A] 10,17,25 * claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]US3509620 (PHILLIPS LEOPOLD SAMUEL) [A] 10* claim 1 *; | [A]US3615870 (CROUTHAMEL MARVIN SNYDER) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US4493939 (BLASKE T ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 10 * claim 1 *; | [Y]GB2160358 (GA TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,9 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870130), vol. 011, no. 033, Database accession no. (E - 476), & JP61201484 A 19860906 (TOHOKU METAL IND LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 10 | by applicant | JPS577215 | JPS5837480 | JPS5964296 | JPS5964298 | JPS59177114 | JPS6071019 | JPS62144726 | JPH05315656 | JPH069260B |