EP0774263 - Method and apparatus for hydrogen peroxide vapor sterilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioquell UK Limited Walworth Road Andover Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Bioquell UK Limited Walworth Road Andover, Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states MICROFLOW LIMITED Walworth Road Andover, Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | ||
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states MDH LIMITED Walworth Road Andover, Hampshire SP10 5AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watling, David Heathcrest, Guildford Road Surrey RH4 3LB / GB | [1997/21] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/48] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1997/21] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308398.5 | 20.11.1996 | [1997/21] | Priority number, date | GB19950023717 | 20.11.1995 Original published format: GB 9523717 | [1997/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0774263 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0774263 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/20, A61L2/24 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
A61L2/208 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
A61L2202/122 (EP);
A61L2202/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1997/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Wasserstoffperoxiddampfsterilisation | [1997/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for hydrogen peroxide vapor sterilization | [1997/21] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la stérilisation par la vapeur de peroxyde d'hydrogène | [1997/21] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Request for further processing for: | 29.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.03.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/04] | ES | 30.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9105573 (AMERICAN STERILIZER CO [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-25 *; | [A]EP0452780 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0384535 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-7 * | by applicant | WO8906140 | USRE33007E | US4169123 | US4169124 |