Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0844179
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.02.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] |
10.09.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] |
28.05.1999 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
25.05.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
25.05.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
16.04.1999 |
Change - designated states |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
12.04.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
22.02.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
22.02.1999 |
Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) |
|
18.02.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
23.12.1998 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] |
09.04.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
02.07.1997 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
22.03.1997 |
Loss of particular rights |
|