EP0844179 - Method of opening flattened bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Change - applicant | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield Illinois 60093 / US | For all designated states MOLINS PLC 11 Tanners Drive Blakelands Milton Keynes MK14 5LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states KRAFT FOODS, INC. Three Lakes Drive Northfield, Illinois 60093 / US | ||
For all designated states MOLINS PLC 11 Tanners Drive Blakelands, Milton Keynes MK14 5LU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seaward, David Robert 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry, CV4 8HS / GB | 02 /
Whitlock, Peter 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry, CV4 8HS / GB | 03 /
Martin, Simon 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry, CV4 8HS / GB | 04 /
Bailey, Thomas William 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry, CV4 8HS / GB | 05 /
Messing, Julian Gregory 13 Westwood Way, Westwood Business Park Coventry, CV4 8HS / GB | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308531.1 | 26.11.1996 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844179 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/30 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B65B43/16 (EP);
B65B43/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1999/28] |
Former [1999/22] | AT | ||
Former [1999/06] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Öffnen von flachgelegten Beuteln | [1998/22] | English: | Method of opening flattened bags | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé pour l'ouverture de sachets repliés à plat | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.05.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 28.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   31.03.1999 | 25.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2281516 (ROYAL THOMAS M) [A] 1-5,9,10,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2932142 (WILLY SINDZINSKI) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4435294 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]) [A] 1,16 * column 2, lines 4-41; figure 1 * | by applicant | GB1003768 | WO8803892 | US5279095 |