EP0777995 - Toilet height increasing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/24] | Toilet seat including height increasing apparatus | ||
[2001/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Landsberger, Kurt 103 Harrison Street Verona New Jersey 07044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states Landsberger, Kurt 103 Harrison Street Verona New Jersey 07044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium 1 Eversholt Street London NW1 2DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308614.5 | 28.11.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | US19950566933 | 04.12.1995 Original published format: US 566933 | EP19960301234 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96301234 | US19960754796 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: US 754796 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0777995 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0777995 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47K13/28, A47K13/26, A47K17/02 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
A47K13/26 (EP);
A47K13/28 (EP);
A47K17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1997/24] | Title | German: | Toilettensitzerhöhungseinrichtung | [2001/19] | English: | Toilet height increasing apparatus | [2001/19] | French: | Surélévateur de siège de toilettes | [2001/19] |
Former [1997/24] | Toilettensitz mit Erhöhungseinrichtung | ||
Former [1997/24] | Toilet seat including height increasing apparatus | ||
Former [1997/24] | Siège de toilettes avec surélévateur | Examination procedure | 04.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2336906 (AYROLLES FRANCOIS [FR]) [A] 1,11,16,18-20 * page 2, line 6 - page 4, line 2; figures 1-7 *; | [A]BE804900Q (BEATRICE FOODS CO) [A] 1,11-13,16,18,20 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 8,10 *; | [AD]US5251338 (LIGHT HOMER E [US]) [AD] 1,6,16,21 * column W *; | [A]GB2177735 (JAMES IND LTD) | by applicant | US4477932 | US5251338 |