EP0779339 - Thermoplastic resin composition for automotive parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosaka, Kazunari 305 Residence Miyuki, 3711, Dai-machi Moka-shi, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Morokuma, Hiroshi 939-3 Kasuda Moka City, 321-43, Tochigi Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Morita, Hisao 15-2-231, 3 chome, Toriishi Takaishi City, Osaka Prefecture / JP | 04 /
Masato, Takaku 3-8 Nishitoriishi Takaishi City, Osaka Prefecure / JP | [1997/25] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/25] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308765.5 | 04.12.1996 | [1997/25] | Priority number, date | JP19950346511 | 12.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34651195 | [1997/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0779339 | Date: | 18.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0779339 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L51/04 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
C08L71/123 (EP);
C08L51/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/25] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung für Fahrzeugteile | [1997/25] | English: | Thermoplastic resin composition for automotive parts | [1997/25] | French: | Composition de résine thermoplastique pour éléments de véhicule | [1997/25] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 14.12.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/12] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0475157 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 51 - line 53 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 25; claim - *; | [X]US3819761 (LEE G) [X] 1,10 * column 7, line 63 - line 65; claim - *; | [X]EP0226149 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 1; claim - *; | [X]EP0548683 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * column 4, line 35 - line 38; claim - *; | [X]EP0605195 (GE PLASTICS JAPAN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, line 30 - line 32; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0266773 (BORG WARNER CHEMICALS INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 3, line 23 - line 25; claim - *; | [X] - BOSCOLETTO A B ET AL, "COMBUSTION AND FIRE RETARDANCE OF POLY(2,6-DIMETHYL-1,4-PHENYLENE ETHER)-HIGH-IMPACT POLYSTYRENE BLENDS. I. MORPHOLOGICAL ASPECTS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (19940705), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 121 - 129, XP000464300 [X] 1,10 * page 121, column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1994.070530113 | [A] - H. F. MARK ET AL., Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), XP002028180 [A] 1 * Vol. 16, pages 88 - 97; page 89 * |