EP0782298 - Carrier sense collision advoidance in a local area network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartley, Lee F. 4713 22nd Avenue NW Calgary, Alberta / CA | 02 /
McKay, Danny 445 Eglinton Avenue E. Apt.800 Toronto, Ontario / CA | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308866.1 | 06.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | CA19952166343 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: CA 2166343 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782298 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413, H04L12/28 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
H04W74/0808 (EP,US);
H04W74/0816 (KR);
H04B1/44 (KR);
H04W84/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/27] | Title | German: | Kollisionsvermeidung durch Trägererfassung in einem lokalen Netz | [1997/27] | English: | Carrier sense collision advoidance in a local area network | [1997/27] | French: | Evitement de collisions par test de porteuse dans un réseau local | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 25.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4259663 (GABLE MELVIN G) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 1, line 14 - line 29 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 3 * * figure 1 * [A] 5,10; | [A]EP0064818 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 10 * * page 5, line 9 - line 21 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 21 * * page 12, line 15 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XAY]EP0224132 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 7 * * figures 1,2,3,4A,4B,5 * [A] 5 [Y] 2,3,7; | [XAY]EP0476444 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 43 - column 7, line 37 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 38 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 5 [Y] 2,3,7; | [YA]EP0621707 (IBM [US]) [Y] 2,3,7 * page 2, line 3 - line 6 * * page 3, line 51 - line 56 * * page 5, line 9 - line 36 * [A] 1,3,5-7; | [A]EP0653864 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * column 1, line 1 - line 51 ** column 2, line 20 - line 54 * |