EP0782029 - Optical appatatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states Lucent Technologies Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmann, Ernest Eisenhardt 730 Seneca Street Bethlehem, Pennsylvania 18015 / US | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96308959.4 | 10.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | US19950578721 | 26.12.1995 Original published format: US 578721 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782029 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02F1/09, G02B5/30 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02F1/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/27] | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung wie etwa ein optischer Zirkulator und Isolator | [1997/27] | English: | Optical appatatus | [1997/27] | French: | Dispositif d'optique, tel qu'un circulateur optique et un isolateur optique | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/44] | 27.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4178073 (UCHIDA TEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 48; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4492436 (BERGMANN ERNEST E [US]) [A] 1* figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0574749 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 8, line 37 - column 9, line 36 * * column 12, line 7 - column 13, line 56; figures 9,11 * | by applicant | US5204771 | - FUJII., JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., (199209), vol. 10, pages 1226 - 1229 |