EP0780758 - Data processing and storage method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2003 [2003/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Logic Corporation 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, CO 80525-2998 / US | [1999/15] |
Former [1998/18] | For all designated states Symbios, Inc. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | ||
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henderson, John C. 90 Millers Gap Road Enola, PA 17025 / US | 02 /
Pelletier, Larry E. 4449 Brittany Drive Lisle, IL 60532 / US | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Gill, David Alan W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309050.1 | 12.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | US19950579029 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: US 579029 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0780758 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0780758 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780758 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G11B27/00, H04N7/173 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/1258 (EP,US);
G11B27/002 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/26] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungs- und speicherverfahren und Gerät dafür | [1997/26] | English: | Data processing and storage method and apparatus | [1997/26] | French: | Traitement et stockage de données et dispositif | [1997/26] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH05128732 ; | [XA]US4607346 (HILL REED A [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * figures 1,4,5 * * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 18 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 12 * * claims 1-12 * [A] 10; | [Y]WO9412937 (STARLIGHT NETWORKS INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 12, line 13 - page 13, line 21 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 2 * * page 19, line 11 - page 20, line 22 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [AP]EP0690626 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0738081 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930913), vol. 017, no. 509, Database accession no. (P - 1612), & JP05128732 A 19930525 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document * [A] 8,9 | [Y] - BIRK Y, "DETERMINISTIC LOAD-BALANCING SCHEMES FOR DISK-BASED VIDEO-ON -DEMANDSTORAGE SERVERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH. IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS, STORAGE - AT THE FOREFRONT OF INFORMATION INFRASTRUCTURES MONTEREY, SEPT. 11 - 14, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950911), no. SYMP. 14, pages 17 - 25, XP000597714 [Y] 1-10 * page 18, column L, line 44 - column R, line 16 * * page 20, column L, line 14 - column R, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1995.528213 | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Anticipatory Mount of MFU Cartridge in an Automated Library.", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (199106), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 138 - 139, XP000210156 [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document * | [A] - HASKIN R L ET AL, "A SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF INTERACTIVE TELEVISION PROGRAMMING", DIGEST OF PAPERS OF THE COMPUTER SOCIETY COMPUTER CONFERENCE (SPRING) COMPCON, TECHNOLOGIES FOR THE INFORMATION SUPERHIGHWAY SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 5 - 9, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19950305), no. CONF. 40, pages 209 - 215, XP000545431 [A] 5-9 * page 215, column L, line 1 - line 33 * | by applicant | US5394382 | US5345375 | - PATTERSON ET AL., "A Case for Redundant Arrays of Inexpensive Disks (RAID)", PROC. ACM SIGMOD, (198806), pages 109 - 116 |