Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0779214
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.12.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] |
17.12.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
30.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.09.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.05.1998 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.01.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
16.05.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] |
02.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] |