Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3727742B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2005 | B2 | JPH09207905 | 12.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU686974B | Global Dossier | 12.02.1998 | B2 | AU7535296 | 26.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0779214 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2000 | B1 | EP0779214 | 02.07.1997 | A3 | EP0779214 | 18.06.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9605981 | 25.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2191168 | 10.09.2002 | C | CA2191168 | 16.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1062228C | 21.02.2001 | C | CN1167719 | 17.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69606511T | 21.06.2000 | T2 | DE69606511D1 | 09.03.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100215151B | 16.08.1999 | B1 | KR970033483 | 22.07.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9606418 | 31.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ299887 | 28.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW393421B | 11.06.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5640899 | 24.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US57332695 | 15.12.1995 |