EP0780832 - Speech coding device for estimating an error in the power envelopes of synthetic and input speech signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/26] | Speech coding device for estimating an error of power envelopes of synthetic and input speech signals | ||
[2002/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyagi, Hiromi, c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/22] |
Former [1997/26] | 01 /
Aoyagi, Hiroma, c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309062.6 | 12.12.1996 | [1997/26] | Priority number, date | JP19950328505 | 18.12.1995 Original published format: JP 32850595 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0780832 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0780832 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780832 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/10, G10L19/12 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G10L19/08 (EP,US);
G10L25/15 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/26] | G10L9/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/26] | Title | German: | Sprachkodierer mit Vorrichtung zur Abschätzung der Abweichung des Leistungsverlaufs eines synthetischen Signals von einem Eingangssignal | [2002/14] | English: | Speech coding device for estimating an error in the power envelopes of synthetic and input speech signals | [2002/25] | French: | Codeur de parole comprenant un dispositif pour estimer l'écart des enveloppes de puissance de signaux synthétiques par rapport aux signaux d'entrée | [2002/14] |
Former [1997/26] | Vorrichtung zur Abschätzung der Abweichung des Leistungsverlaufs eines synthetischen Signals von einem Eingangssignal in einem Sprachkodierer | ||
Former [1997/26] | Speech coding device for estimating an error of power envelopes of synthetic and input speech signals | ||
Former [1997/26] | Dispositif pour estimer l'écart des enveloppes de puissance de signaux synthétiques par rapport aux signaux d'entrée dans un codeur de parole | Examination procedure | 10.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 15.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0654909 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4 * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 2; figure 1 *; | [AD] - ATAL B S, "High-quality speech at low bit rates: multipulse and stochastically excited linear predictive coders", ICASSP 86 PROCEEDINGS. IEEE-IECEJ-ASJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.86CH2243-4), TOKYO, JAPAN, 7-11 APRIL 1986, 1986, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 1681 - 1684 vol.3, XP002071240 [AD] 1 * figure 4 * |