EP0786396 - An emergency transporter for a patient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunwa Ltd. 21-5 Sendagaya 5-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misawa, Rintaro 1300-2, Ooaza Yamaguchi Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken, 350-13 / JP | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | ||
Former [1997/31] | BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309164.0 | 17.12.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | JP19960009640 | 23.01.1996 Original published format: JP 964096 | JP19960009641 | 23.01.1996 Original published format: JP 964196 | JP19960269604 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: JP 26960496 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786396 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786396 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/075, A61G5/06 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
A61G5/061 (EP);
A61G5/066 (EP);
B62D55/075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/31] | Title | German: | Ein Rettungs-Transportgerät für einen Patienten | [1997/31] | English: | An emergency transporter for a patient | [1997/31] | French: | Un transporteur de secours pour un malade | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.2001 | CH | 26.09.2001 | FR | 26.09.2001 | LI | 26.09.2001 | [2017/04] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
FR | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 26.09.2001 | |
CH | 26.09.2001 | ||
LI | 26.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 26.09.2001 | |
LI | 26.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2538245 (SUNWA SHARYO MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * page 3, line 15 - page 9, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4627508 (AUER PETER [CH]) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 27 - column 9, line 18; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4671369 (TIFFIN PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1,11* column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE19522939 (SUNWA SHARYO MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 32; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JPH037551B |