EP0789306 - Computer system data I/O by reference among multiple CPUs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/33] | Computer system data I/O by reference among multiple cpus | ||
[1997/34] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 SH 249 Houston, Texas 77070-2698 / US | ||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED 10435 N. Tantau Avenue Cupertino, California 95014-0709 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fishler, Leonard R. 10544 Rampart Avenue Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
Zargham, Bahman 1527 Orillia Court Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1997/33] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309266.3 | 19.12.1996 | [1997/33] | Priority number, date | US19950575533 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: US 575533 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0789306 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0789306 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/46, H04L12/56 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L2101/604 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/33] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/33] | Title | German: | Dateneingangs-/-ausgangsvorrichtung durch Referenzierung zwischen mehreren zentralen Verarbeitungseinheiten | [1997/33] | English: | Computer system data I/O by reference among multiple CPUs | [1997/34] | French: | Système d'entrée/sortie de données par référence parmi plusieurs unités centrales de traitement | [1997/33] |
Former [1997/33] | Computer system data I/O by reference among multiple cpus | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/43] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0201063 (COMPUTER X INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 20 - page 3, line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 35 * * page 9, line 16 - page 15, line 30 * * figures 2-4,7 *; | [X]US4674033 (MILLER CHRISTOPHER G [GB]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 35 * * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 21 * * claims 1,6-8,15 *; | [X]EP0539012 (KENDALL SQUARE RESEARCH CORP [US]) [X] 3,5,7 * page 3, line 35 - page 8, line 12 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 13 * * page 13, line 45 - page 14, line 29 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]EP0676878 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 35 - line 46 * * page 6, line 13 - page 17, line 35 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - BURD D, "ZERO-COPY INTERFACING TO TCP/IP", DR. DOBB'S JOURNAL,US,SAN MATEO, CA, (19950901), vol. 20, no. 9, page 68,70,72,74,, XP000672215 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - EICKEN VON T ET AL, "U-NET: A USER-LEVEL NETWORK INTERFACE FOR PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW (SIGOPS),US,ACM HEADQUARTER. NEW YORK, (19951201), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 40 - 53, XP000584816 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/224057.224061 | [A] - TOMASEVIC M ET AL, "HARDWARE APPROACHES TO CACHE COHERENCE IN SHARED-MEMORY MULTIPROCESSORS, PART 1", IEEE MICRO,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19941001), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0272-1732, pages 52 - 59, XP000476680 [A] 1-8 * page 55 - page 56 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MM.1994.363067 | by applicant | US4817091 | US19950377302 | US19950485217 |