EP0795825 - Semiconductor memory with a redundant circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satou, Kenji c/o Oki Micro Des. Miyazaki Co.Ltd, 9-2 Yamato-cho Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki-pref. / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Yuichi c/o Oki Micro Des.Miyazaki Co.Ltd, 9-2 Yamato-cho Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki-pref. / JP | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/38] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309473.5 | 23.12.1996 | [1997/38] | Priority number, date | JP19960036189 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3618996 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0795825 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0795825 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
G11C29/808 (EP,US);
G11C29/00 (KR);
G11C29/848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1997/38] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicher mit redundanter Schaltung | [1997/38] | English: | Semiconductor memory with a redundant circuit | [1997/38] | French: | Mémoire à semi-conducteur à circuit de redondance | [1997/38] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/16] | 05.11.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.11.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/16] | Divisional application(s) | EP02024031.3 / EP1288967 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0401957 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 3 * * page 11, column 19, line 54 - column 21, line 29; figures 10A,10B * * page 13, column 24, line 45 - page 14, column 26, line 39; figure 13 * [A] 3 [Y] 4,5; | [YA]US5323348 (MORI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 3, line 12 - line 27; figure 3 * * column 5, line 14 - line 50 * * column 6, line 32 - line 21; figure 5 * [A] 1-5 |