EP0786804 - Apparatus and method for processing substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ye, Yan 3862 Via Salice Cambell / US | 02 /
Yin, Gerald Zheyao 10132 Bilich Place Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Ma, Diana Xiabing 19600 Kilt Court California / US | 04 /
Mak, Steve S.Y. 878 Montevino Drive Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309550.0 | 24.12.1996 | [1997/31] | Priority number, date | US19960592821 | 26.01.1996 Original published format: US 592821 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0786804 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0786804 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C16/44, H01L21/306 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
H01L21/67069 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32642 (EP,US);
H01L21/68721 (EP,US);
Y10S156/915 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/31] | H01L21/306, H05H1/46, H01J37/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Behandeln von Substraten | [1997/31] | English: | Apparatus and method for processing substrates | [1997/31] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour le traitement de substrats | [1997/31] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 01.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/09] | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5213658 (ISHIDA TOMOAKI [JP]) [X] 20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0639850 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7-9,13,20 * figures 8,13,14; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5423918 (GUPTA ANAND [US], et al) [DA] 1,7,8,13-17,20* column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3 *; | [PA]US5552124 (SU YIN-JIA [US]) [PA] 1,7-9,20 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 9; figures 2-11; claim 1 *; | [PX]US5556500 (HASEGAWA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,13,20 * figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [PX]US5578164 (KURONO YOICHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,7,13,14,16,17 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 54; figure 3 * | by applicant | US5201990 | US5423918 | EP0694949 | - SZE S.M., VLSI Technology., NEW YORK., MCGRAW-HILL PUBLISHING CO. | US19940277531 |