EP0784214 - An optical tracing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELOP ELECTRO-OPTICS INDUSTRIES LTD. Kiryat Weizmann, P.O. Box 1165 Rehovot 76111 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states ELOP ELECTRO-OPTICS INDUSTRIES LTD. Kiryat Weizmann, P.O. Box 1165 Rehovot 76111 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krimermann, Joseph 20 Hatzalafim Street Haifa 34739 / IL | 02 /
Friedland, Igor 52 Moshe Sharett Street, Apt. 51 Holon 58553 / IL | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309568.2 | 31.12.1996 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | IL19960116717 | 09.01.1996 Original published format: IL 11671796 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0784214 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0784214 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784214 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/46 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
G01S17/48 (EP,US);
G01S7/4876 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/29] | Title | German: | Optisches Abtastsystem | [1997/29] | English: | An optical tracing system | [1997/29] | French: | Système de tracement optique | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 22.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.11.2002 | SE | 27.02.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/19] | SE | 27.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4933853 (MUSIL JOSEPH E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2233182 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4242189 (LEICA SENSORTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4456826 | US4774403 | US4911551 | US5015868 | US5129725 |