EP0850821 - Rubber crawler track [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumano, Youichi 1-508, kashiwaocho 525-chome, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309569.0 | 31.12.1996 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850821 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850821 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/24 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B62D55/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/27] | Title | German: | Gummigleiskette | [1998/27] | English: | Rubber crawler track | [1998/27] | French: | Chenille de caoutchouc | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638472 (FUKUYAMA RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 3; figures 1-4 * |