EP0784243 - Development system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruber, Robert J. 40 Rosewood Drive Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | 02 /
Hays, Dan A. 297 Mason Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1997/29] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96309581.5 | 31.12.1996 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | US19960010168 | 11.01.1996 Original published format: US 10168 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784243 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784243 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G15/01 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
G03G15/0808 (EP,US);
G03G15/0803 (EP,US);
G03G15/0887 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0174 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0621 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0651 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/29] | Title | German: | Entwicklungssystem | [1997/29] | English: | Development system | [1997/29] | French: | Système de développement | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 11.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4777106 (FOTLAND RICHARD A [US], et al) [DA] 1* figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0494454 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5132735 (HOWLAND LEON A [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0620507 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *; | [PX]WO9639647 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-3 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US4777106 | US19680060101 |