EP0735539 - Double deck video cassette tape recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Ku Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Sumio Daitoh Oriental Building 3F, 30-10, 2-chome Daitoh Daitoh-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1996/40] | Application number, filing date | 96400694.4 | 29.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | JP19950076331 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: JP 7633195 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735539 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735539 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/024, H04N9/79, H04N9/80, G11B5/86 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
G11B20/02 (KR);
G11B27/024 (EP,US);
G11B5/86 (EP,US);
H04N9/79 (EP,US);
G11B2220/455 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/40] | Title | German: | Doppeldeck-Videokassettenaufzeichnungsgerät | [2001/38] | English: | Double deck video cassette tape recorder | [1996/40] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à cassettes vidéo, à double platine | [1996/40] |
Former [1996/40] | Doppeldeck-Videokasettenaufzeichnungsgerät | Examination procedure | 14.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 05.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01248896 ; | [A]JPS6057791 ; | [A]JPH0547107 ; | [A]DE3920591 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5057934 (YUN JONG-KYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5075803 (MORO EIJI [JP], et al) [A] * column A *; | [A]DE4117974 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5223943 (IMURA HISAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 6 - line 30 * * column 3, line 46 - column 6, line 19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891227), vol. 13, no. 594, Database accession no. (E - 867), & JP01248896 A 19891004 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850806), vol. 9, no. 189, Database accession no. (E - 333), & JP60057791 A 19850403 (RICOH K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930705), vol. 17, no. 354, Database accession no. (P - 1567), & JP05047107 A 19930226 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.) [A] * abstract * | Examination | US5121266 |