EP0737003 - CCD register readout amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atmel Grenoble S.A. Avenue de Rocheplaine 38120 Saint-Egrève / FR | [2001/44] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF SEMICONDUCTEURS SPECIFIQUES 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortiula, Jean Alain Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [2002/33] |
Former [1996/41] | 01 /
Cortiula, Jean ALain Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400711.6 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/41] | Priority number, date | FR19950003950 | 04.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9503950 | [1996/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737003 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737003 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/335 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
H03F3/345 (EP,US);
H04N3/155 (US);
H04N25/75 (EP);
H04N25/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | Ausleseverstärker für CCD-Register | [1996/41] | English: | CCD register readout amplifier | [1996/41] | French: | Amplificateur de lecture de registre CCD | [1996/41] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2180717 (RCA CORP); | [XA]US4710725 (WHITE CHARLES M [US], et al); | [X]US4979035 (UEHARA MASAO [JP], et al) |