EP0740048 - Process for inhibiting or delaying the formation, the growth and/or the agglomeration of hydrates in production effluents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delion, Anne Sophie 4 rue Dalou 75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Durand, Jean-Pierre 61 D rue Jules Ferry 78400 Chatou / FR | 03 /
Gateau, Patrick 15 rue des Iles Glénan 78310 Maurepas / FR | 04 /
Velly, Marie 4 Square du Var 75020 Paris / FR | [1996/44] | Application number, filing date | 96400776.9 | 10.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | FR19950005099 | 26.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9505099 | [1996/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740048 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740048 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E21B37/06 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
C09K8/52 (EP,US);
C10L3/06 (EP,US);
C09K2208/22 (EP,US);
Y10S585/95 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Inhibieren oder Hemmen der Formation, des Wachs und/oder der Agglomerierung von Hydraten in Produktionsabflüssen | [1996/44] | English: | Process for inhibiting or delaying the formation, the growth and/or the agglomeration of hydrates in production effluents | [1996/44] | French: | Procédé pour inhiber ou retarder la formation la croissance et/ou l'agglomération des hydrates dans les effluents de production | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0594479 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-4,10-14 * claims 1-5,7,9 * * column 1, line 1 - line 8 * * example 9 *; | [DA]EP0323774 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [DA]EP0582507 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) |