EP0738487 - Assembly procedure for furniture elements and furniture obtained from this assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAUTIER FRANCE S.A. BP 10 85510 Le Boupère / FR | [1996/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guesdon, Robert J. 26, rue de Groteau 85500 Les Herbiers / FR | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Busnel, Jean-Benoît, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Busnel, Jean-Benoît, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400840.3 | 19.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | FR19950004717 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: FR 9504717 | [1996/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738487 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738487 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47B95/04, F16B12/46 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
A47B95/043 (EP);
F16B12/46 (EP);
A47B2230/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [1996/43] | Title | German: | Zusammenbauverfahren für Möbelelemente und Möbel das von diesen Zusammenbau gebildet ist | [1996/43] | English: | Assembly procedure for furniture elements and furniture obtained from this assembly | [1996/43] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage d'éléments de mobilier et mobilier résultant de cet assemblage | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4220212 (ACKERMANN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4840440 (MONROW) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0125336 (SCHOCK & CO. GMBH) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3; figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE1528345 (FEZER) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 1,4; claim 1 * |