EP0751036 - Metallic tube element and backrest frame for motor vehicle seats provided with such element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CESA COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE SIEGES POUR AUTOMOBILES 20, rue Paul Vaillant-Couturier 92307 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR | [1998/29] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states CESA COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE SIEGES POUR AUTOMOBILES 20, rue Paul Vaillant-Couturier F-92307 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillemard, Philippe 65, avenue Georges Bannery 45290 Nogent sur Vernisson / FR | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400847.8 | 19.04.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | FR19950007941 | 30.06.1995 Original published format: FR 9507941 | [1997/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751036 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751036 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/44, B21K21/12 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B60N2/682 (EP);
B21K21/12 (EP);
B60N2/686 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | Metalltubenteil und Sitzrückenlehne für Kraftfahrzeugsitzrückenlehne mit einem solchen Teil | [1997/01] | English: | Metallic tube element and backrest frame for motor vehicle seats provided with such element | [1997/01] | French: | Elément de tube métallique et armature pour dossier de siège de véhicule automobile munie de cet élément | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.07.1998 | SE | 15.10.1998 | [2003/09] |
Former [1999/29] | SE | 15.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0625445 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * column 9, line 39 - column 10, line 18; figure 7 *; | [A]DE9416771U (F INNENHOCHDRUCK VERFAHREN MBH) [A] 1,8 * page 6 - page 8; figures 2-8 *; | [A]US4625537 (ALECK BENJAMIN J) [A] 1 * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 39; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO9316896 (ITT); | [A]EP0259201 (PEUGEOT CYCLES); | [A]FR1081524 (REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT) |