blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0740086

EP0740086 - Arrangement for damping by fluid lamination and motor vehicle suspension system equiped with such a damping arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[2000/04]
Former [1996/44]For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Doré, Jacques
191, Rue Saint-Denis
92700 Colombes / FR
02 / Oustaloup, Alain
44, Rue Georges Bizet
33400 Talence / FR
03 / Nouillant, Michel
94, Rue du Général Marguerite
33400 Talence / FR
04 / Moreau, Xavier
4, Lieu dit Lainier Lagorce
33230 Coutras / FR
[1996/44]
Representative(s)Berger, Helmut, et al
Cabinet Weinstein
176 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/38]Berger, Helmut (DE), et al
Cabinet Weinstein 56A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1996/44]Berger, Helmut, et al
Cabinet WEINSTEIN 20, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96400861.923.04.1996
[1996/44]
Priority number, dateFR1995000508427.04.1995         Original published format: FR 9505084
[1996/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0740086
Date:30.10.1996
Language:FR
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0740086
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.1996
ClassificationIPC:F16F9/46, F16F13/26, B60G17/015
[1996/44]
CPC:
B60G17/0152 (EP,US); F16F13/262 (EP,US); F16F9/46 (EP,US);
B60G2500/11 (EP,US); B60G2600/26 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/44]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Dämpfung durch Flüssigkeitsschichtung und Kraftfahrzeugaufhängungssystem mit einer solchen Dämpfungseinrichtung[1996/44]
English:Arrangement for damping by fluid lamination and motor vehicle suspension system equiped with such a damping arrangement[1996/44]
French:Agencement d'amortissement par laminage d'un fluide et système de suspension notamment de véhicule automobile, équipé d'un tel agencement d'amortissement[1996/44]
Examination procedure06.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/18]
16.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1999Fee for grant paid
02.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS57146933  ;
 [A]JPS60113832  ;
 [A]EP0346040  (WARNER BRIAN) [A] 1,11-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 25 *;
 [A]DE3316025  (FREUDENBERG TILLMANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8909891  (KONI BV [NL]) [A] 1,2,11 * page 5, line 23 - page 7; figures 3,4 * * abstract *;
 [A]WO9212359  (KONI BV [NL]) [A] 1-4,11 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - page 7 *;
 [A]FR1242350  (RENAULT) [A] 1,11,12 * page 1, column L, paragraph 4 - page 2, column R, paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4022099  (BOGE AG) [A] 1,3,4,11,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS57171133  ;
 [A]DE9210834U  (AUGUST BILSTEIN GMBH) [A] 1,9,11,13 * figure - *;
 [A]US2061068  (OTTEN FUCHS HENRY) [A] 1,11,12 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US3827538  (MORGAN F) [A] 3-7,11,12 * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 46; figures 7-9 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821208), vol. 006, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 177), & JP57146933 A 19820910 (AISHIN SEIKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851025), vol. 009, no. 268, Database accession no. (M - 424), & JP60113832 A 19850620 (TOUKAI GOMU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830119), vol. 007, no. 012, Database accession no. (M - 186), & JP57171133 A 19821021 (KAYABA KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.