blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0739767

EP0739767 - Automatic and manual level control device for a motor vehicle axle with hydropneumatic suspension or analog [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[2000/08]
Former [1996/44]For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lamorlette, Bruno
47, Rue Hoche
78800 Houilles / FR
[1996/44]
Representative(s)Berger, Helmut, et al
Cabinet Weinstein
176 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/44]Berger, Helmut, et al
Cabinet WEINSTEIN 20, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date96400862.723.04.1996
[1996/44]
Priority number, dateFR1995000508527.04.1995         Original published format: FR 9505085
[1996/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0739767
Date:30.10.1996
Language:FR
[1996/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0739767
Date:23.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.1996
ClassificationIPC:B60G17/04, B60G17/056
[1996/44]
CPC:
B60G17/0277 (EP); B60G17/0565 (EP); B60G21/0555 (EP);
B60G2202/135 (EP); B60G2202/413 (EP); B60G2500/30 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/44]
TitleGerman:Automatische und manuelle Niveauregelungsvorrichtung für eine Kraftfahrzeugsachse mit hydropneumatischer Aufhängung oder ähnliches[1996/44]
English:Automatic and manual level control device for a motor vehicle axle with hydropneumatic suspension or analog[1996/44]
French:Dispositif de commande de hauteur automatique et manuelle pour un essieu de véhicule automobile à suspension hydropneumatique ou analogue[1996/44]
Examination procedure20.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/16]
25.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.1999Fee for grant paid
15.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0311465  (PEUGEOT ;CITROEN SA (FR)) [X] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 20; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0256897  (PEUGEOT ;CITROEN SA (FR)) [X] 1 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0611671  (PEUGEOT ;CITROEN SA (FR)) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.