EP0741052 - Cover structure for utility vehicle with a movable stanchion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL TRAILERS FRANCE 1 et 3 Rue Marcel Carné, Immeuble II Courcouronnes 91042 Evry / FR | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states General Trailers France 1-3 rue Marcel Carné 91042 Evry Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DE SEMI-REMORQUES - SESR - Immeuble Espace Europe II, 1 & 3, rue Marcel Carné 91042 Evry Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Carl Kiebitzweg 7 42111 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Michelet, Alain Cabinet Harlé et Phelip 21 rue de la Rochefoucauld 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400954.2 | 03.05.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | FR19950005419 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9505419 | [1996/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741052 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741052 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/06 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B60J5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1996/45] | Title | German: | Gestell zur Abdeckung eines Nutzfahrzeuges mit einer bewegbaren Runge | [1996/45] | English: | Cover structure for utility vehicle with a movable stanchion | [1996/45] | French: | Véhicule utilitaire comportant un bâti de couverture avec un rancher mobile | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2168011 (NMI TRUCK BODIES) [A] 1,2,5,10 * page 2, line 106 - page 3, line 14 * * page 3, line 34 - line 62; figures 4,6 *; | [A]DE9312295U (POMMIER) [A] 1-3,5-7,10 * page 3, line 20 - page 6, line 29; figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP0335427 (VAN HOOL) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0621151 (DONA) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2507434 (WACKENHUT) [A] 8 * page 8, line 3 - line 20; figures 2,4,5 * | Examination | EP0736404 |