EP0741057 - Luggage cover for an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE D'ETUDE ET DE RECHERCHE POUR L'AUTOMOBILE (CERA) 5 rue Emile Arques 51100 Reims / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states CENTRE D'ETUDES ET RECHERCHE POUR L'AUTOMOBILE ( CERA) 5 rue Emile Arques F-51100 Reims / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghebali, César 35 avenue Maurice Prolongée 93220 Gagny / FR | 02 /
Carpentier, Alain 8 rue Hourlier 51000 Reims / FR | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Geismar, Thierry, et al NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2009/37] |
Former [2001/14] | Geismar, Thierry, et al Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/21] | Geismar, Thierry, et al Cabinet Geismar, 90 avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1996/45] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96400963.3 | 06.05.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | FR19950005338 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9505338 | [1996/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741057 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741057 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B60R5/045 (EP);
B60R5/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | Ladagutabdeckung für eine Kraftfahrzeug | [1996/45] | English: | Luggage cover for an automotive vehicle | [1996/45] | French: | Cache-bagages pour véhicule automobile | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 04.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/10] | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.1999 | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.03.2001 | FI | 14.03.2001 | GB | 14.03.2001 | IE | 14.03.2001 | IT | 14.03.2001 | NL | 14.03.2001 | LU | 06.05.2001 | BE | 31.05.2001 | DK | 14.06.2001 | SE | 14.06.2001 | GR | 15.06.2001 | PT | 15.06.2001 | DE | 16.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
LU | 06.05.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
DK | 14.06.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
GR | 15.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
LU | 06.05.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
DK | 14.06.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
DK | 14.06.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
DK | 14.06.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
NL | 14.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
PT | 15.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
GB | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
DE | 16.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
IE | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
FI | 14.03.2001 | ||
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 14.03.2001 | |
SE | 14.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 14.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2624947 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1-4 * figure - * * page 4, line 28 - page 7, line 2 *; | [A]US4220367 (GALE THOMAS C [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure - * * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 54 *; | [A]DE2941018 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE4040038 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure - * * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 33 *; | [A]DE4110089 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * figure -; claim 1 * * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 22 *; | [A]EP0524397 (IEPER IND NV [BE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 33 * |