04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
17.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
18.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
27.04.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
02.03.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
12.05.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
12.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
13.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.06.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.12.1998 |
First examination report |
|
15.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.01.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] |
04.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] |