EP0743407 - Cast floor covering comprising incrustated elements with a predetermined decorative surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS BOULENGER 21, rue Pajol F-75018 Paris / FR | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berlemont, Jacques 44 rue Kleinpeter 95270 Viarmes / FR | 02 /
Poupon, Xavier 40 rue de la Bidassoa 75020 Paris / FR | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Lhuillier, René, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 52, avenue Daumesnil 75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401048.2 | 14.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | FR19950005905 | 18.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9505905 | [1996/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743407 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743407 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/12, C04B26/02 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
C04B26/02 (EP);
E04F15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, PT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Gegossener Bodenbelag mit eingebetteten Elementen mit einer bestimmten dekorativen Oberfläche | [1996/47] | English: | Cast floor covering comprising incrustated elements with a predetermined decorative surface | [1996/47] | French: | Revêtement de sol coulé comportant des éléments incrustés présentant une surface décorative prédéterminée | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2000 | ES | 28.06.2000 | IT | 28.06.2000 | DK | 28.09.2000 | PT | 28.09.2000 | SE | 28.09.2000 | GR | 29.09.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
GR | 29.09.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
DK | 28.09.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
ES | 28.06.2000 | ||
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
SE | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 28.06.2000 | |
PT | 28.09.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 28.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1509879 (SCHAEFER HERBERT) [A] 1-4,7,9 * page 2, line 21 - page 7, line 18; figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE1659362 (ABEND DR ING RUDOLF) [A] 1,2,5,7 * page 2, line 10 - page 6, line 24 *; | [A]GB1213592 (WELTY LLOYD G [US], et al) [A] 1,5,7 * page 2, line 55 - line 90 * * page 2, line 109 - page 4, line 118; figures 1,3; claims 1,2,6,7 *; | [A]DE2151174 (DESCOL KUNSTSTOF CHEMIE NV) [A] 1,2,5,7 * page 2, line 22 - page 5, line 13 *; | [A]EP0086626 (REED INT PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 19 ** page 5, line 8 - page 11, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE29500612U (MARMOR IND KIEFER GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 13; figure 1 * | Examination | GB604190 | - "Avis Technique 12/92-724 CIBELASTIC", BULLETIN DES AVIS TECHNIQUES DU CENTRE SCIENTIFIQUE ET TECHNIQUE DU BATIMENT, PARIS, FRANCE, (19930301), no. 336, pages 1 - 3 |