EP0744604 - Installation for the detection of helium in a fluid circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/32] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states ALCATEL CIT 12 Rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gevaud, Roland 85 Route St. Christophe, Pringy 74370 Argonay / FR | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/19] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Technologies C.I.P.D. 23/25, avenue Morane-Saulnier 92360 Meudon La Foret / FR | ||
Former [1996/48] | Gosse, Michel, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401094.6 | 20.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | FR19950006220 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9506220 | [1996/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744604 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744604 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
G01M3/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1996/48] | Title | German: | Installation zum Nachweis von Helium in einem Flüssigkeitskreislauf | [1996/48] | English: | Installation for the detection of helium in a fluid circuit | [1996/48] | French: | Installation pour détecter la présence d'helium dans un circuit de fluide | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 14.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Inficon GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2002
ADMISSIBLE Inficon GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 50859 Köln / DE | deleted | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.12.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.07.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.04.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/42] | 20.04.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.05.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4459844 (BURKHART CHRISTOPHER W [US]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [Y]EP0365042 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0534825 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * |