EP0756860 - Hair cleaning cosmetic composition and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubief, Claude 9 rue Edmond Rostand 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 02 /
Cauwet-Martin, Danièle 53 rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [1997/06] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Miszputen, Laurent L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle Centre Charles Zviak 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401292.6 | 13.06.1996 | [1997/06] | Priority number, date | FR19950008271 | 07.07.1995 Original published format: FR 9508271 | [1997/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0756860 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0756860 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/50 | [1997/06] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/817 (EP,US);
A61K8/88 (EP,US);
A61K8/899 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/06] | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Haarwaschmittel und dessen Verwendung | [1997/06] | English: | Hair cleaning cosmetic composition and its use | [1997/06] | French: | Compositions cosmétiques détergentes à usage capillaire et utilisation de ces dernières | [1997/06] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 29.10.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219830 (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-33 * claims 1-15 ** column 3, line 8 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]EP0392320 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-33 * claims 1,2 * * examples 2-4 * * examples 2,4 *; | [Y]EP0531650 (GOLDWELL AG [DE]) [Y] 1-33 * claims 1,2 *; | [DY]WO9323009 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DY] 1-33 * claims 1-33 * * page 25, line 30 - page 26, line 6 * * page 40, line 31 - page 43, line 10 * * examples 21-25 *; | [DA]EP0582152 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-33 * claims 1-7 * * page 7, lines 1-13 * * examples 1-5 *; | [A]WO9406409 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1-33 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 17 * |