EP0750172 - Caliper gage for calibrating a reading apparatus of a spectacle frame shape and calibrating method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/52] | Caliper gage for calibrating a reading apparatus of a spectacle frame shape and calibrating method therefor | ||
[2000/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillermin, Laurent 10 Passage du Chantier 75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
Hougas, Henri 24 Allée des Charmes 77020 Ozoir la Ferriere / FR | 03 /
Horel, Patrick 13 rue Voltaire 92300 Levallois Perret / FR | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais 75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401355.1 | 20.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | FR19950007555 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: FR 9507555 | [1996/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750172 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750172 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750172 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/20, G01B7/28 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
G01B3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [1996/52] | Title | German: | Eichkaliber zum Eichen einer Konturlesevorrichtung für Brillenfassung und entsprechendes Eich-Verfahren | [1996/52] | English: | Caliper gage for calibrating a reading apparatus of a spectacle frame shape and calibrating method therefore | [2000/27] | French: | Calibre étalon pour l'étalonnage d'un appareil de lecture de contour pour monture de lunettes, et procédé d'étalonnage correspondant | [1996/52] |
Former [1996/52] | Caliper gage for calibrating a reading apparatus of a spectacle frame shape and calibrating method therefor | Examination procedure | 26.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 02.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0424207 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3 - column 9 *; | [D]FR2652893 (ESSILOR INT [FR]); | [A]FR2669999 (GERBER OPTICAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 12 - page 28 *; | [A]EP0639754 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 4 - column 15 *; | [A]EP0583915 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-13 *; | [A]JPH06270046 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941221), vol. 018, no. 679, Database accession no. (M - 1728), & JP06270046 A 19940927 (TOPCON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |