EP0758182 - Solid-state image sensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshihara, Satoshi c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Maki, Yasuhito c/o Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401514.3 | 10.07.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | JP19950173222 | 10.07.1995 Original published format: JP 17322295 | [1997/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0758182 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0758182 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, H04N5/217 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
H04N25/701 (EP,US);
H04N25/63 (US);
H04N25/633 (EP);
H04N25/671 (EP);
H04N25/673 (EP);
H04N25/71 (EP,US);
H04N25/713 (EP,US);
H04N25/74 (EP,US);
H04N25/745 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/07] | Title | German: | Festkörperbildaufnahmevorrichtung | [1997/07] | English: | Solid-state image sensing device | [1997/07] | French: | Capteur d'images à l'état solide | [1997/07] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/05] | 20.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/19] | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]EP0633691 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) |