EP0758130 - Process and device for storing used nuclear reactor control rods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubourg, Michel 2 rue Saint Cyran 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Bouget, Lucien Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401563.0 | 15.07.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | FR19950009686 | 09.08.1995 Original published format: FR 9509686 | [1997/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758130 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758130 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/34, G21C19/36 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
G21C19/36 (EP);
G21F9/34 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, LI [1997/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung benutzter Kontrollstäbe von Kernreaktoren | [1997/07] | English: | Process and device for storing used nuclear reactor control rods | [1997/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de stockage de barres de commande usagées d'un réacteur nucléaire | [1997/07] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4788027 (KRIEG ADRIAN H [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4648989 (KLEIN WILLIAM J [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0344051 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4434092 (MARY PAUL [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 5; claims 1-3 * |