EP0754452 - Pharmaceutical preparation in form of coated capsule releasable at lower part of digestive tract [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states TANABE SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatano, Harumi No. 1-4-319, Imafuku 1-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Ito, Takahiro No. 39-1, Minamikinomoto-cho 4-chome Yao-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Ishibashi, Takashi 12-103 Shimotsuike-Jutaku 545-33, Nagasone-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Yoshino, Hiroyuki No. 8-A9-101, Yamadanishi 2-chome Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Mizobe, Masakazu No. 15-1-310, Makita-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1997/06] |
Former [1997/04] | 01 /
Hatano, Harumi No. 1-4-319, Imafuku 1-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ito, Takahiro No. 39-1, Minamikinomoto-cho 4-chome Yao-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | |||
03 /
Ishibashi, Takashi No. 545-33, Nagasone-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | |||
04 /
Yoshino, Hiroyuki No. 8-A9-101, Yamadanishi 2-chome Suita-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | |||
05 /
Mizobe, Masakazu No. 15-1-310, Makita-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Boulinguiez, Didier, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1997/04] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401604.2 | 18.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19950183655 | 20.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18365595 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0754452 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0754452 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754452 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/52, A61K9/48 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/4891 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1997/04] | A61K9/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | Im unteren Teil des Verdauungstrakts freisetzende pharmazeutische Zubereitung in Form einer beschichteten Kapsel | [1997/04] | English: | Pharmaceutical preparation in form of coated capsule releasable at lower part of digestive tract | [1997/04] | French: | Préparation pharmaceutique sous forme d'une capsule enrobée pour la libération dans la partie inférieure du tube digestif | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0425699 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-7* the whole document * |