EP0755843 - Reach adjustable steering column with guiding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEMFORDER NACAM S.A. Zone Industrielle Sud, Route de Blois 41100 Vendome / FR | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fevre, Laurent 17, Résidence Les Gros Saules 41000 Saint-Sulpice / FR | 02 /
Bodin, Jean-Christophe 2, rue Bourvil 41100 Saint-Ouen / FR | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phelip 21 rue de la Rochefoucauld 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401669.5 | 25.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | FR19950009110 | 26.07.1995 Original published format: FR 9509110 | [1997/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755843 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755843 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
B62D1/185 (EP,US);
F16C29/002 (EP,US);
F16C3/00 (EP,US);
F16F1/3835 (EP,US);
F16C2326/24 (EP,US);
F16F2230/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1997/05] | Title | German: | Höhenverstellbare Lenksäule mit Führungseinrichtung | [1997/05] | English: | Reach adjustable steering column with guiding device | [1997/05] | French: | Colonne de direction réglable en profondeur, avec dispositif de guidage | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0315823 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [DY] 1,2,10,12 * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 10; figure 5 * [A] 4,9; | [YDA]US3665777 (JENSEN FINN BENZON) [YD] 1,2,10,12 * column 1, line 49 - line 51; figure 7 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 2; figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 19 - line 21 * * column 2, line 21 - line 22; figures 5,6 * [A] 11; | [AD]DE3339926 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [AD] 1-3,5-9,11 * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 17; figure - * |