EP0762774 - Image signal encoding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro, c/o Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Desormiere, Pierre-Louis, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96401825.3 | 27.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | JP19950245430 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: JP 24543095 | [1997/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762774 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762774 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/527 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/527 (EP,US);
H04N23/6811 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/98 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/683 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/11] | H04N7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/11] | Title | German: | Bildsignalkodierungsvorrichtung | [1997/11] | English: | Image signal encoding apparatus | [1997/11] | French: | Dispositif de codage d'un signal d'image | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 21.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP08167088.7 / EP2028842 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 20   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0419752 (RAI RADIOTELEVISIONE ITALIANA [IT]) [A] 1,7,8,10,11,16-18 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 31 * * abstract *; | [YA]EP0498730 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 12 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 57 * * abstract * [A] 1-11,13-18; | [A]EP0538042 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18* abstract *; | [A]EP0649256 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,16 * page 2, line 1 - line 57 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0652678 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,8,10,16,17 * column 3, line 17 - line 54 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 3 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 2 * * column 14, line 39 - column 15, line 18 * * abstract *; | [A]US5430480 (ALLEN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,10,11,16-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US5438360 (EDWARDS MICHAEL K [US]) [A] 1,5,6,8,9,13,14 * column 2, line 34 - line 40 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 4 * * column 10, line 45 - column 12, line 21 * * figures 8,13 *; | [PXAY]US5497191 (YOO YONG T [KR], et al) [PX] 8,10,11,15,17,18 * the whole document * [PA] 1,7,9,16 [PY] 12; | [A] - YI TONG TSE ET AL, "GLOBAL ZOOM/PAN ESTIMATION AND COMPENSATION FOR VIDEO COMPRESSION", MULTIDIMENSIONAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, TORONTO, MAY 14 - 17, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910514), vol. 4, no. CONF. 16, pages 2725 - 2728, XP000453526 [A] 1,7,8,10,11,16-18 * sections 1,3,4 * * abstract * | by applicant | EP0419752 |