EP0768525 - Method of detecting a gas phase molecular species in the chamber effluent of a semiconductor processing chamber, and semiconductor processing system incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/16] | System for monitoring chamber exit gases by means of absorption spectroscopy, and semiconductor processing system incorporating the same | ||
[2002/25] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1997/16] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mc Andrew, James J.F. 15425 Purley Court Lockport, Illinois 60441 / US | 02 /
Wang, Hwa-Chi 1582 Culpepper drive Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 03 /
Jurcik, Benjamin J. 2182 Stonehaven way Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [1997/16] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1997/16] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide Service des Relations Industrielles 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402130.7 | 07.10.1996 | [1997/16] | Priority number, date | US19950005013 | 10.10.1995 Original published format: US 5013 | US19960634449 | 18.04.1996 Original published format: US 634449 | US19960711781 | 10.09.1996 Original published format: US 711781 | [1997/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0768525 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0768525 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0768525 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0768525 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0768525 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/39, G01N21/35, G01J3/433 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
G01N21/031 (EP,US);
C23C16/4412 (EP,US);
G01J3/433 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N21/3554 (EP,US);
G01N21/39 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/16] | G01N21/39, G01N21/35 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Detektion von gasförmigen, molekularen Spezien in den Kammerabgasen einer Halbleiterprozesskammer, und damit ausgerüstetes Halbleiterverarbeitungssystem | [2008/41] | English: | Method of detecting a gas phase molecular species in the chamber effluent of a semiconductor processing chamber, and semiconductor processing system incorporating the same | [2002/25] | French: | Procédé pour détecter d'espèces moléculaires en phase gazeuse des gaz de sortie d'une chambre de traitement d'un matériau semi-conducteur, et système de traitement d'un matériau semi-conducteur ainsi équipé | [2008/41] |
Former [1997/16] | System zur Überwachung von Kammerabgasen mittels Absorptionsspektroskopie, und damit ausgerüstetes Halbleiterverarbeitungssystem | ||
Former [1997/16] | System for monitoring chamber exit gases by means of absorption spectroscopy, and semiconductor processing system incorporating the same | ||
Former [1997/16] | Système de contrôle des gaz de sortie d'une chambre par spectroscopie d'absorption, et système de traitement d'un matériau semi-conducteur ainsi équipé | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 28.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V Hansastrasse 27 c D-80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V Hansastrasse 27 c D-80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al, et al Gostritzer Strasse 61-63 01217 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2004/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2004
28.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V Hansastrasse 27 c D-80686 München / DE Opponent's representative Grambow, Uwe (DE), et al, et al Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Gostritzer Strasse 61-63 D-01217 Dresden / DE | 07.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.11.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.01.2007 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.06.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0468/07 | 11.01.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Request for further processing for: | 26.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - GRISAR R ET AL, "FAST SAMPLING DEVICES FOR DYNAMIC EXHAUST GAS ANALYSIS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY AND AUTOMATION (ISATA), FLORENCE, MAY 20 - 24, 1991, NUCLEARE E DELLE ENERGIE ALTERNATIVE (ENEA), (19910520), no. SYMP. 24, pages 283 - 287, XP000308622 [X] 1,2,8,11,13,42,43,50,58,60 * page 284; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6,12,14,44,45,47,59,61 | [Y] - FRIED A, "VERSATILE INTEGRATED TUNABLE DIODE LASER SYSTEM FOR HIGH PRECISION: APPLICATION FOR AMBIENT MEASUREMENTS OF OCS", APPLIED OPTICS, (19910520), vol. 30, no. 15, pages 1916 - 32, XP000207533 [Y] 3,4,6,12,14,44,45,47,59,61 * page 1918, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.30.001916 | [A] - JASINSKI ET AL, "DETECTION OF SIH2 IN SILANE AND DISILANE GLOW DISCHARGES BY FREQUENCY MODULATION ABSORPTION SPECTROSCOPY", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (198406), vol. 44, no. 12, pages 1155 - 1157, XP002036448 [A] 23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.94675 | [A] - DAVIES P B ET AL, "INFRARED LASER DIAGNOSTICS IN METHANE CHEMICAL-VAPOR-DEPOSITION PLASMAS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19920615), vol. 71, no. 12, pages 6125 - 6135, XP000301544 [A] 23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.351361 | Opposition | - J.A.O'Neill u.a.; "Infraread absorption spectroscopy for monitoring condensible gases in chemical vapour deposition applications; J.Vac.Sci. Technol. A12(3) (1994, Seiten 839 bis 845 | - A.E. Gruber u.a.; "Online exhaust gas analytics during plasma cleaning of PECVD facilities"; Spie Vol. 2637 Sept. 1995), Seiten 147 bis 155 | - M.J.Goeckner u.a.; "Using Fourier transform infrared absorption spectrometry to probe the injected neutral gas in a plasma having a highionozation fraction"; J.Vac. Sci. Technol. A11(3);(1993), Seiten 689 bis 693 | - T.A.Cleland u.a.; "detection of dry etching product species with in situ Fourier transform infrared spectroscopy"; J.Vac. Sci. Technol. B7(1); (1989), Seiten 35 bis 40 | - R.Kästle u.a.; "Using diode laser spectroscopy to monitor process gas purity"; MICROCONTAMINATION (1991), Seiten 27 bis 31 | - D.C.Peters u.a. ; "Calibration techniques for FTIR process monitoring" in "Optical Methods for Chemical Process Control"; edited by S. Farquhason; SPIE Vol. 2069 (1993), Seiten 32 bias 41 |