blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0773126

EP0773126 - Structured element with a coating, and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATRA AUTOMOBILE
4 Rue de Presbourg
75116 Paris / FR
[1997/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Decroix, Philippe
4, Impasse de l'Ourcq
78310 Maurepas / FR
02 / Marcellas, Michel
40, rue Pavoisier
78470 Saint-Remy / FR
03 / Champion, Alain
6, rue du Grelet
18100 Vierzon / FR
[1997/20]
Representative(s)Fort, Jacques
CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[1997/20]
Application number, filing date96402370.907.11.1996
[1997/20]
Priority number, dateFR1995001314807.11.1995         Original published format: FR 9513148
[1997/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0773126
Date:14.05.1997
Language:FR
[1997/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0773126
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60J5/04
[1997/20]
CPC:
B60J5/0412 (EP); B60J5/0481 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/20]
TitleGerman:Konstruktionselement mit Verkleidung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchenElements[1997/20]
English:Structured element with a coating, and method for its manufacture[1997/20]
French:Pièce de structure et de garnissage et procédé de fabrication d'une telle pièce[1997/20]
Examination procedure26.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
26.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.1999Fee for grant paid
05.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2658235  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 34; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE1923943  (KARMANN GMBH W) [A] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 12; figure - *;
 [A]GB2119839  (FIAT AUTO SPA) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 72 - line 127; figure - *;
 [A]DE3209052  (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1 * page 24, line 23 - page 25, line 2; figure 4; claims 6,7,49 *;
 [A]EP0318640  (SCHMIDT GMBH R [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2416809  (PEUGEOT ACIERS ET OUTILLAGE [FR])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.