blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0780627

EP0780627 - Process and apparatus for cleaning the end plate of a heat exchanger from the inner side of the heat exchanger bundle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRAMATOME
Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
FRAMATOME
Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Magnin, Bernard
Les Hautes Terres
42630 Saint Victor sur Rhins / FR
02 / Vouzelaud, Alain
12 avenue des Bruyères
69270 Fontaines sur Saône / FR
03 / Bourdelet, Martin
49 avenue Lacassagne
69003 Lyon / FR
04 / Weber-Guevara, Catherine
105 Cours Gambetta
69003 Lyon / FR
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Bouget, Lucien, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/26]Bouget, Lucien, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date96402509.221.11.1996
[1997/26]
Priority number, dateFR1995001541822.12.1995         Original published format: FR 9515418
[1997/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0780627
Date:25.06.1997
Language:FR
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0780627
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1997
ClassificationIPC:F22B37/48
[1997/26]
CPC:
F28G3/16 (EP,US); F22B37/483 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   LI,   SE [1997/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung der Endplatte eines Wärmetauschers vom Innern des Wärmetauscherbündels[1997/26]
English:Process and apparatus for cleaning the end plate of a heat exchanger from the inner side of the heat exchanger bundle[1997/26]
French:Procédé et dispositif de nettoyage d'une plaque tubulaire d'un échangeur de chaleur depuis l'intérieur du faisceau de l'échangeur de chaleur[1997/26]
Examination procedure02.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/27]
14.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR2514108  [ ] (FRAMATOME SA [FR]);
 [DY]EP0077255  (FRAMATOME & CIE [FR], et al) [DY] 1,4 * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 1; figures 1,2,9 *;
 [A]FR2550967  (INNUS IND NUCLEAR SERVICE [CH]) [A] 1-4 * page 11, line 1 - page 19, line 21; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [A]EP0307961  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0459597  (ELECTRIC POWER RES INST [US]) [A] 1,4* column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 48; figures 1-3 *;
 [YA]WO9530861  (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [Y] 1,4 * page 11, line 13 - page 11, line 29 * * figures 1,3-5,9 * [A] 2
by applicantFR2514108
 FR19940010008
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.