EP0783189 - Microwave planar antenna array for communicating with geostationary television satellites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGENCE SPATIALE EUROPEENNE 8-10, rue Mario Nikis F-75015 Paris / FR | [1997/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rammos, Emmanuel Floris Versterlaan 1 Oegstgeest / NL | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard, et al Novagraaf Technologies SA 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [2008/42] |
Former [1997/28] | Keib, Gérard, et al c/o BREVETS RODHAIN & PORTE, 3 rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402668.6 | 09.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | FR19960000020 | 03.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9600020 | [1997/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783189 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/00 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
H01Q21/24 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0075 (EP,US);
H01Q21/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | Flache Mikrowellen-Gruppenantenne für die Kommunikation mit geostationären Fernsehsatelliten | [1997/28] | English: | Microwave planar antenna array for communicating with geostationary television satellites | [1997/28] | French: | Antenne réseau plane hyperfréquence pour communiquer avec des satellites de télévision géostationnaires | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 04.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0252779 (RAMMOS EMMANUEL) [YD] 1,5-9,16 * column 10, line 18 - column 11, line 6; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP0228742 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR], et al) [Y] 1,5-9,16 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 4; figure 1 * * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 4 *; | [Y]DE4313396 (HIRSCHMANN RICHARD GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO9529519 (CONTINENTAL MICROWAVE TECHNOLO [GB], et al) [A] 1,5,7,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5400042 (TULINTSEFF ANN N [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 49 - line 59; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4239597 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,7,10,17 * column 7, line 15 - line 37; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0355898 (RAMMOS EMMANUEL) [A] 15 * column 4, line 38 - line 42; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2219143 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0123350 (ELECTRONIQUE & PHYSIQUE [FR], et al) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | EP0252779 | - JUN-ICHI TAKADA ET AL., "A Dual Beam-POlarized Radial Line Slot Antenna", IEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, (1993), pages 1624 - 1627 | - J.R. JAMES HALL, P.S. HALL, IEE, J.R. JAMES HALL, P.S. HALL, IEE, R.P. OWENS, Handbook of Microstrip Antennas, LONDRES, PETER PEREGRINUS, (1989), vol. II, pages 825-843, - 858-866 |