EP0782272 - Digital processing circuit with gain control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [2002/37] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 9, place des Vosges La Défense 5 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delmas, Christian Thomson Multimedia 92050 Paris La Defense Cedex / FR | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/27] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96402782.5 | 18.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | FR19950015745 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: FR 9515745 | [1997/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782272 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782272 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
H03M1/0619 (EP,US);
H03M1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/27] | Title | German: | Digitale Verarbeitungsschaltung mit Verstärkungsregelung | [1997/27] | English: | Digital processing circuit with gain control | [1997/27] | French: | Circuit de traitement numérique à contrôle de gain | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/09] | 27.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06260936 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941214), vol. 018, no. 661, Database accession no. (E - 1644), & JP06260936 A 19940916 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | Examination | US4598269 | US5369403 | - "Data Sheet: AD7574", ANALOG DEVICES, NORWOOD, MA, page 1 |