EP0754965 - Tabular grain silver halide emulsions, a method for their preparation, and photographic products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1997/04] | For:FR
KODAK-PATHE 26, rue Villiot F-75594 Paris Cedex 12 / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gourlaouen, Luc Renaud, c/o Kodak Pathe Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 02 /
Friour, Gérard Amédé Désiré, c/o Kodak Pathe Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 03 /
Jezequel, Pierre-Henri, c/o Kodak Pathe Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 04 /
Jordi, Frédéric Xavier, c/o Kodak Pathe Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | 05 /
Lebrat, Jean-Pascal Francis, c/o Kodak Pathe Département Brevets, CRT - Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saone Cedex / FR | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1997/04] | Parent, Yves, et al Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96420220.4 | 28.06.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | FR19950008681 | 10.07.1995 Original published format: FR 9508681 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754965 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754965 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/005 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
G03C1/0051 (EP,US);
G03C1/08 (EP);
G03C2001/0055 (EP);
G03C2200/01 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G03C1/0051, G03C2001/0055, G03C2200/01, G03C1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/04] | Title | German: | Tafelförmige Silberhalogenidemulsionen, ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, und photographische Erzeugnisse | [1997/04] | English: | Tabular grain silver halide emulsions, a method for their preparation, and photographic products | [1997/04] | French: | Emulsions aux grains tabulaires à l'halogénure d'argent, un procédé pour leur préparation, et produits photographiques | [1997/04] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 31.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0569971 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-6 * page 3, line 22 * * page 3, line 33 - line 40 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 2 * * page 8, line 10 - line 15 * * page 10, line 15 - line 16 ** page 13, line 54 - page 14, line 1 * |