EP0766003 - Ignition system for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation Co., Ltd. 2681, Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation Co., Ltd. 2681, Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | ||
Former [1997/14] | For all designated states Mitsuba Corporation 2681, Hirosawa-cho 1-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Satoru 2504-2-3, Ooaza Azami, Kasakake-machi Nitta-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanase, Atsushi 167-10, Fukushima, Tamamura-machi Sawa-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/14] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 96420302.0 | 24.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950254203 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25420395 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766003 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0766003 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0766003 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02P3/08 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
F02P15/12 (EP);
F02P3/08 (KR);
F02B61/02 (EP);
F02P1/086 (EP);
F02P11/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/14] | F02P1/08, F02P3/08 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1997/14] | Title | German: | Zündsystem für innere Brennkraftmaschine | [1997/14] | English: | Ignition system for internal combustion engines | [1997/14] | French: | Système d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6185577 ; | [A]US4537174 (NAGASAWA MASAO [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 5, line 9 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2189840 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1,2,6 * page 3, line 39 - line 65; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860905), vol. 010, no. 261, Database accession no. (M - 514), & JP61085577 A 19860501 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * |