EP0750451 - Plasma torch with electromagnetic coil for independent and integral arc base displacement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE, Société Anonyme 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE, Société Anonyme dite: 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spariat, Jean-Marie Jacques 8 avenue Eugène Delacroix 33160 Saint Medard en Jalles / FR | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres 33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 96450015.1 | 19.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | FR19950007791 | 23.06.1995 Original published format: FR 9507791 | [1996/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750451 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/40 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H05H1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | Plasmabrenner mit elektromagnetische Spule zur unabhängige und vollständige Bogenendebewegung | [1996/52] | English: | Plasma torch with electromagnetic coil for independent and integral arc base displacement | [1996/52] | French: | Torche à plasma à bobine électromagnétique de déplacement du pied d'arc indépendante et intégrée | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/34] | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0427590 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [DA] 1,2 * column W *; | [DA]FR2609358 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US3832519 (WOLF C, et al); | [A]US3663792 (FEY MAURICE G) |