EP0781898 - Improvement to internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tacquet, Maurice-André 14, Allée des Prés F-59650 Villeneuve D'Ascq / FR | [1997/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/27] | Application number, filing date | 96490045.0 | 20.11.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | FR19950014507 | 29.11.1995 Original published format: FR 9514507 | [1997/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781898 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/28, F01L9/02 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
F01L1/285 (EP);
F01L9/11 (EP);
F01L1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/27] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Brennkraftmaschinen | [1997/27] | English: | Improvement to internal combustion engines | [1997/27] | French: | Perfectionnement aux moteurs alternatifs à combustion interne ceux-ci comportant des culasses à soupapes concentriques | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 19.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE200793 (STEINGASSER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 28 ** figure 1 *; | [A]GB416496 (CHARLES EDWARD MACLEA MARCH) [A] 1 * page 3, line 92 - page 4, line 106 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR852101 (JAMES & BOUTELEUX) [A] 1 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9508052 (MELCHIOR TECHNOLOGIE [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 33, line 3 - page 35, line 30 * * figures 1-6 * |