EP0801194 - Multipoint locking structure for a closure mechanism with sliding rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIESSE GROUP IBERIA, S.A. Constitucio, 76, Poligon Industrial Les Grases 08980 Sant Feliu de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | [2000/20] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states A.T.P. ALUMINIO TECNOLOGIA Y PRODUCTO S.A. Constitucio, 76, Poligon Industrial Les Grases 08980 Sant Feliu de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plaza Marti, Gemma Avinguda 300 n. 45 08860 Castelldefels, Barcelona / ES | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Manresa Val, Manuel, et al Rambla de Catalunya, 32,2o 2a 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Manresa Val, Manuel, et al Girona n. 34 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 96500040.9 | 11.04.1996 | [1997/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801194 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801194 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/08 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
E05B65/087 (EP);
E05C9/006 (EP);
E05C9/185 (EP);
E05C9/22 (EP);
E05B17/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, PT [1997/42] | Title | German: | Mehrpunkt-Verriegelungsstruktur für einen Verschlussmechanismus mit Gleitschiene | [1997/42] | English: | Multipoint locking structure for a closure mechanism with sliding rail | [1997/42] | French: | Structure de verrouillage multipoint pour mécanisme de fermeture à glissière | [1997/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0566447 (STREMLER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0389447 (GIESSE) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2590309 (FERCO INTERNATIONAL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0629760 (R. FRAIGNEAU) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2591267 (FERCO INTERNATIONAL) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0278704 (FULLEX) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |