EP0748715 - Auxiliary seat for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/51] | Improved auxiliary seat for vehicles | ||
[2001/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asientos Esteban, S.L. Poligono Industrial Landaben, Calle L 31012 Pamplona (Navarra) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Asientos Esteban, S.L. Poligono Industrial Landaben, Calle L 31012 Pamplona (Navarra) / ES | ||
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states INDUSTRIAS ESTEBAN, S.A. Poligono Industrial Landaben, Calle L E-31012 Pamplona (Navarra) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irmler, Helmut, Industrias Esteban, S.A. Poligono Industrial Landaben c/L 31012 Pamplona, (Navarra) / ES | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 21 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 96500074.8 | 12.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | ES19950001172 | 12.06.1995 Original published format: ES 9501172 | [1996/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0748715 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0748715 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748715 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/30 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
B60N2/3047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/51] | Title | German: | Zusatzsitz für Fahrzeuge | [1996/51] | English: | Auxiliary seat for vehicles | [2001/13] | French: | Siège auxiliaire pour véhicules | [1996/51] |
Former [1996/51] | Improved auxiliary seat for vehicles | Examination procedure | 31.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9112092U (KARL KÄSSBOHRER FAHRZEUGWERKE GMBH) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE9320377U (MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0572811 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE8533952U (IGNAZ VOGEL GMBH UND CO KG - FAHRZEUGSITZE) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |